NY S08807 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Title
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1886 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10791 (Same As) 2018-05-18 - referred to agriculture