NY S08819 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.352
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of St. Johnsville to hire a village clerk/treasurer and code enforcement officer who is not a resident of such village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of St. Johnsville to hire a village clerk/treasurer and code enforcement officer who is not a resident of such village.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.352
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.383
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10956
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to local governments
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1625
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10956 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8819

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback