NY S08829 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nassau county civil divisions act relating to the purposes of the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of East Meadow.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the Nassau county civil divisions act relating to the purposes of the Volunteer and Exempt Fireman's Benevolent Association of East Meadow.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.353
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.425
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10999
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to local governments
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1626
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-23SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10999 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8829

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback