NY S08837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to civil service provisional employees in New York city; extends certain provisions relating thereto.
Title
Relates to civil service provisional employees in New York city; extends certain provisions relating thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A11241 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1976 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8837A |
2018-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A11241 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.419