NY S08840 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reducing the number of overnight rooms and suites from 120 to 75 at a certain premises in the city of Canandaigua, county of Ontario, for purposes of an exemption on restrictions on manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Title
Relates to reducing the number of overnight rooms and suites from 120 to 75 at a certain premises in the city of Canandaigua, county of Ontario, for purposes of an exemption on restrictions on manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.269 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.378 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10915 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1889 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10915 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8840