NY S08841 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain lands used in the single operation for the production of hopyards in the definition of agricultural land and provides a real property tax abatement for the owners of certain hopyards.
Title
Includes certain lands used in the single operation for the production of hopyards in the definition of agricultural land and provides a real property tax abatement for the owners of certain hopyards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10097 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1778 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10097 (Same As) 2018-08-16 - signed chap.192