NY S08844 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyVETOED MEMO.378
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.423
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10935a
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31SenateAMENDED (T) 8844A
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1402
2018-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10935 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8844a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback