NY S08845 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10774A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10774A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the radon task force to conduct a comprehensive study on the prevention of human exposure to radon and make recommendations to reduce and minimize exposure to New York state residents; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Creates the radon task force to conduct a comprehensive study on the prevention of human exposure to radon and make recommendations to reduce and minimize exposure to New York state residents; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10774A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2068 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8845A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10774 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.414