NY S08857 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the description of certain lands to be excepted as necessary for above-ground appurtenances in the village of Mamaroneck.
Title
Relates to the description of certain lands to be excepted as necessary for above-ground appurtenances in the village of Mamaroneck.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.393 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.258 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10867 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1739 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10867 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8857