NY S08870 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10744A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10744A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an additional certification classification for minority and women-owned businesses which are ineligible for certification due to exceeding the personal net worth of small business thresholds.
Title
Establishes an additional certification classification for minority and women-owned businesses which are ineligible for certification due to exceeding the personal net worth of small business thresholds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10744A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2069 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8870A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10744 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled