NY S08878 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.270
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to certain examinations taken by funeral directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to certain examinations taken by funeral directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07AssemblySIGNED CHAP.270
2018-08-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.462
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11068
2018-06-20Assemblyreferred to health
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2071
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-31SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A11068 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8878

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback