NY S08910 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an assessing unit within the town of Neversink, county of Sullivan, to file their tentative assessment roll for 2018 no later than June 30, 2018.
Title
Permits an assessing unit within the town of Neversink, county of Sullivan, to file their tentative assessment roll for 2018 no later than June 30, 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.111 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a11062a |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1894 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8910A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11062 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8910a