NY S08932 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.186
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the amount of a property tax shift from one class of property to another for 2018-2019 in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Limits the amount of a property tax shift from one class of property to another for 2018-2019 in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.186 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.241 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a5297 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1694 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |