NY S08940 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Spectrum Designs Foundation Ltd. for portions of the 2016-2017 school and general taxes and all of the 2017-2018 school and 2018 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Spectrum Designs Foundation Ltd. for portions of the 2016-2017 school and general taxes and all of the 2017-2018 school and 2018 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.452
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.396
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11137
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695
2018-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11137 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8940

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback