NY S08972 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.512
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to real property tax exemptions for certain property owners who are required to participate in the federal flood insurance program because his or her real property is located in a special flood hazard area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to real property tax exemptions for certain property owners who are required to participate in the federal flood insurance program because his or her real property is located in a special flood hazard area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.512
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.409
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a9967b
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1984
2018-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 8972B
2018-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 8972A
2018-06-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09967 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8972b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08972&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08972&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08972
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08972&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08972A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08972&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08972B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8972#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8972#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08972&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback