NY S08973 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that persons employed in the labor class for a minimum of five years shall not be removed or otherwise subjected to any disciplinary penalty provided in this section except for incompetency or misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that persons employed in the labor class for a minimum of five years shall not be removed or otherwise subjected to any disciplinary penalty provided in this section except for incompetency or misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07AssemblySIGNED CHAP.271
2018-08-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.398
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11223
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1897
2018-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11223 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8973

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback