NY S08985 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11213
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the New York Racing Association, Inc. to the list of dormitories under the public authorities law.
Title
Adds the New York Racing Association, Inc. to the list of dormitories under the public authorities law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A11213 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2019 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8985A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11213 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.418