NY S08986 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition of the local advisory board for the Belmont racetrack facility; 15 members designated by the temporary president of the senate; speaker of the assembly and the franchised corporation.
Title
Relates to the composition of the local advisory board for the Belmont racetrack facility; 15 members designated by the temporary president of the senate; speaker of the assembly and the franchised corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1900 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |