NY S08989 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain acts and proceedings of the town board of the town of Thurman, Warren county, in relation to the issuance of obligations for the financing of alternate water supply systems for five homes as required by a consent order of the department of environmental conservation and also for a municipal building.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain acts and proceedings of the town board of the town of Thurman, Warren county, in relation to the issuance of obligations for the financing of alternate water supply systems for five homes as required by a consent order of the department of environmental conservation and also for a municipal building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1901 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8989A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11157 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - reported referred to rules