NY S09004 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary commission on AMBER Alert effectiveness to study and make recommendations on any improvements that may be taken toward the activation and dissemination of the alert; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishes a temporary commission on AMBER Alert effectiveness to study and make recommendations on any improvements that may be taken toward the activation and dissemination of the alert; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2142 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11234 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - referred to governmental operations