NY S09021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.453
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts certain parcels of land from the provisions of law which generally restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain parcels of land from the provisions of law which generally restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.453
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.492
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11210
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to economic development
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1905
2018-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 9021A
2018-06-15SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11210 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9021a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback