NY S09039 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.515
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the granting of a permanent vested easement for the Hudson river rail tunnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the granting of a permanent vested easement for the Hudson river rail tunnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.515
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.481
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11231a
2018-06-20Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1991
2018-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 9039B
2018-06-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 9039A
2018-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11231 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9039b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S09039&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S09039&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S09039
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S09039&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S09039A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S09039&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S09039B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S9039#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S09039&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S9039#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback