NY S09053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Columbia/Dutchess carbon farming pilot project to study the carbon sequestration potential of a range of farming practices in Columbia and Dutchess counties, including, but not limited to, those practices already promoted by the state; and provides for the repeal of such program upon expiration thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a Columbia/Dutchess carbon farming pilot project to study the carbon sequestration potential of a range of farming practices in Columbia and Dutchess counties, including, but not limited to, those practices already promoted by the state; and provides for the repeal of such program upon expiration thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.326
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.264
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a11111
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1911
2018-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11111 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s9053

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback