NY S09061 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows judicial notice of an image, map, location, distance, calculation, or other information taken from a web mapping service, a global satellite imaging site, or an internet mapping tool, when requested by a party to the action, subject to a rebuttable presumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows judicial notice of an image, map, location, distance, calculation, or other information taken from a web mapping service, a global satellite imaging site, or an internet mapping tool, when requested by a party to the action, subject to a rebuttable presumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.19
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.516
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.491
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11191
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1914
2018-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11191 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9061

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback