NY S09089 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to correcting the spelling of the Verrazzano-Narrows bridge.
Title
Relates to correcting the spelling of the Verrazzano-Narrows bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.288 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.295 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a2963b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1853 |
2018-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02963 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s9089