NY S09103 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.454
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the lease of certain lands located at the State University of New York at Stony Brook; authorizes the state university trustees to lease and otherwise contract to make available to The Southampton Hospital Association a portion of the lands of the university on its Southampton campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the lease of certain lands located at the State University of New York at Stony Brook; authorizes the state university trustees to lease and otherwise contract to make available to The Southampton Hospital Association a portion of the lands of the university on its Southampton campus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.454
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.494
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11244
2018-06-20Assemblyreferred to higher education
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2082
2018-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 9103A
2018-06-17SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2018-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A11244 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9103a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback