OH HB1 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2951.041, 2953.31, and 2953.32 of the Revised Code to modify the requirements for intervention in lieu of conviction and for sealing records of conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify intervention in lieu of conviction/sealing requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateIntroduced
2019-06-19HousePassed
2019-06-18HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2951Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295331Amended CodeCitation Text
295332Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback