OH HB107 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-22)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-22)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 122.177 of the Revised Code to authorize the Development Services Agency to award grants to businesses that employ high school students in career exploration internships and to make an appropriation.
Title
To authorize the Development Services Agency to award grants to businesses that employ high school students in career exploration internships and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Effective Date | |
2014-03-26 | Governor' Action | |
2014-03-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-12 | Concurrence | |
2014-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-21 | To Finance | |
2013-11-21 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-07 | Committee Report* A | |
2013-03-20 | To *Finance and Appropriations | |
2013-03-20 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 177 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 25 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 26 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 29 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |