OH HB112 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Re-referred: Financial Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5739.121 of the Revised Code to allow vendors to receive a refund of sales tax remitted for certain bad debts charged off as uncollectible by credit account lenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit vendors to receive sales tax refund for certain bad debts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseRe-referred: Financial Institutions
2019-03-27HouseRe-referred: Ways and Means
2019-03-05HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
5739121Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback