OH HB113 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4513.612 of the Revised Code to prohibit a private towing service from employing or compensating spotters.
Title
Prohibit towing service from employing spotters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-03-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |