OH HB119 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4511.202, 4511.204, 4511.205, 4511.75, and 4511.991 of the Revised Code to make corrective changes to the distracted driving and texting-while-driving law and to add the offenses of failure to control and passing a stopped school bus to the distracted driving law.
Title
Regards traffic law violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-24 | House | Passed |
2019-10-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2019-03-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Public Safety
State and Local Government
Taxation
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Public Safety
State and Local Government
Taxation
Transportation
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 991 | Amended Code | Citation Text |