OH HB12 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective 3/19/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To create the Ohio Children's Behavioral Health Prevention Network Stakeholder Group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Children's Behavioral Health Prevention Network Group

Sponsors

Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19 Effective 3/19/20
2019-12-12HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2019-12-11SenatePassed
2019-12-04SenateReported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-06-17SenateIntroduced
2019-06-13HousePassed
2019-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback