OH HB129 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-05-08 - To Judiciary Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Civil Justice Committee
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-05-08 - To Judiciary Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Civil Justice Committee
Summary
To authorize for a two-year period a pilot program that allows the members of the Ohio Developmental Disabilities Council, the Ohio Statewide Independent Living Council, the Governor's Council on People with Disabilities, and the facility governing board and judicial advisory board that govern or advise on the STAR Community Justice Center in Franklin Furnace, Ohio, to be present at board meetings by teleconference or interactive video teleconference, and to require reports on the effects of member participation in meetings in this manner.
Title
Pilot program-certain councils/board-meet by means of telecommunication
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-08 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2008-05-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-05-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-04-24 | Committee Report | |
2007-03-27 | To * Civil & Commercial Law | |
2007-03-27 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_129 |