OH HB129 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-23)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Effective 5/22/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-23)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Effective 5/22/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4511.84 of the Revised Code to permit a person to wear earphones or earplugs for hearing protection while operating a motorcycle.
Title
Permit wearing hearing protection while riding motorcycle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Effective 5/22/20 | |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-06-27 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-03-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |