OH HB133 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-35)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4743.04 and 5903.04 and to enact section 4743.041 of the Revised Code to require state occupational licensing agencies, under certain circumstances, to issue temporary licenses or certificates to members of the military and spouses who are licensed in another jurisdiction and have moved to Ohio for military duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Issue temporary occupational license if in Ohio for active duty

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. John Becker [R]
Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-20SenateIntroduced
2019-06-19HousePassed
2019-05-30HouseReported - Amended: State and Local Government
2019-03-19HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4743Amended CodeCitation Text
474304Amended CodeCitation Text
4743041New CodeSee Bill Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5903Amended CodeCitation Text
590304Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback