OH HB136 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2929.02, 2929.022, 2929.024, 2929.03, 2929.04, 2929.06, 2941.148, 2953.21, 2953.23, 2971.03, and 2971.07 and to enact section 2929.025 of the Revised Code to prohibit imposing the death penalty for aggravated murder when the offender had a serious mental illness at the time of the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit death penalty if mentally ill at time of offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-06-06SenateIntroduced
2019-06-05HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider
2019-06-05HousePassed - Amended
2019-05-30HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292902Amended CodeCitation Text
2929022Amended CodeCitation Text
2929024Amended CodeCitation Text
2929025New CodeSee Bill Text
292903Amended CodeCitation Text
292904Amended CodeCitation Text
292906Amended CodeCitation Text
2941Amended CodeCitation Text
2941148Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295321Amended CodeCitation Text
295323Amended CodeCitation Text
2971Amended CodeCitation Text
297103Amended CodeCitation Text
297107Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback