OH HB137 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-15)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 4113.14 of the Revised Code to require an employer to provide earnings and deductions statements to each of the employer's employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide earnings and deductions statements to employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-05-30SenateIntroduced
2019-05-29HousePassed
2019-05-23HouseReported: Commerce and Labor
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41New CodeSee Bill Text
4113New CodeSee Bill Text
411314New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback