OH HB14 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5101.85, 5101.851, and 5101.853; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 5101.853 (5101.855); to enact new section 5101.853 and sections 5101.854 and 5101.856; and to repeal section 5101.852 of the Revised Code to require a region-based kinship care navigator program and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require a region-based kinship care navigator program

Sponsors

Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced
2019-06-12HousePassed
2019-06-11HouseReported: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred - Amended: Rules and Reference
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510185Amended CodeCitation Text
5101851Amended CodeCitation Text
5101852Repealed CodeCitation Text
5101853Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback