OH HB144 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-16)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3727.53 and to enact section 3727.58 of the Revised Code to prohibit a hospital from requiring a registered nurse or licensed practical nurse to work overtime as a condition of continued employment.
Title
Prohibit overtime work for nurses as a condition of employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2019-03-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 27 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |