OH HB151 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-17)
Status: Passed on November 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-22 - Effective 11/22/20 - Sections 4 and 5 effective 12/16/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-17)
Status: Passed on November 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-22 - Effective 11/22/20 - Sections 4 and 5 effective 12/16/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1349.05, 4734.04, 4734.05, 4734.15, 4734.25, 4734.283, 4734.285, and 4734.31 and to enact sections 3702.98, 3702.981, 3702.982, 3702.983, 3702.984, 3702.985, 3702.986, 3702.987, 3702.988, 3702.989, 3702.9810, and 4734.151 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 2 of H.B. 606 of the 133rd General Assembly to create the Chiropractic Loan Repayment Program and revise certain laws administered by the State Chiropractic Board; to make changes to prohibitions regarding soliciting employment after a motor vehicle accident or crime; to clarify the effect of government orders on the temporary civil immunity for injuries caused by the transmission or contraction of or exposure to certain viruses; to grant temporary qualified civil immunity to health care isolation centers during a disaster or emergency; to temporarily authorize emergency medical technicians to perform certain emergency medical services in hospitals; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Affects chiropractors-loan repayment program/revise law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-22 | Effective 11/22/20 - Sections 4 and 5 effective 12/16/2020 | |
2020-11-19 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-11-18 | House | Amendments laid over under the rule |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Passed |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Informally passed |
2020-02-10 | House | Informally passed |
2020-02-06 | House | Informally passed |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2019-03-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 49 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 02 | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 981 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 9810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 982 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 983 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 984 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 985 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 986 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 987 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 988 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 989 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 34 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 34 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 34 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |