OH HB154 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-12)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 133.06, 3302.036, 3302.042, 3302.16, 3302.17, 3310.03, 3311.29, and 3314.102; to enact new section 3302.10; and to repeal sections 3302.10, 3302.101, 3302.102, 3302.11, and 3302.12 of the Revised Code; and to repeal Sections 4, 5, and 6 of Am. Sub. H.B. 70 of the 131st General Assembly to dissolve academic distress commissions and to instead require improvement plans for certain low-performing school buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dissolve and replace academic distress commissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2019-05-02SenateIntroduced
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
133Amended CodeCitation Text
13306Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3302Amended CodeCitation Text
3302036Amended CodeCitation Text
3302042Amended CodeCitation Text
330210Repealed CodeCitation Text
3302101Repealed CodeCitation Text
3302102Repealed CodeCitation Text
330211Repealed CodeCitation Text
330212Amended CodeCitation Text
330216Amended CodeCitation Text
330217Amended CodeCitation Text
330218Amended CodeCitation Text
3310Amended CodeCitation Text
331003Amended CodeCitation Text
3311Amended CodeCitation Text
331129Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
3314102Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback