OH HB164 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2953.36 and 2953.51 of the Revised Code to allow a person who is convicted of an offense that may not be sealed to apply to have the conviction sealed if, before the person makes that application, the offense is changed so that it may be sealed and to specify that investigation reports the Inspector General maintains are not official records sealable under the Not Guilty/Dismissed Charges/No Bill Record Sealing Law.
Title
Authorizes sealing of an offense if later made sealable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-10-07 | House | Passed |
2015-06-10 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2015-04-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 53 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |