OH HB164 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 61-6)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Effective 9/18/20 - Emergency and appropriations: effective 6/19/2020; certain provisions effective 9/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3313.601, 3314.02, 3314.03, 3326.11, 3328.24, and 3781.1010 and to enact sections 3320.01, 3320.02, 3320.03, and 3323.10 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 265.210 and 265.335 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, Sections 16 and 17 of H.B. 197 of the 133rd General Assembly, and Section 7 of S.B. 216 of the 132nd General Assembly regarding student religious expression, regarding retention under the Third Grade Reading Guarantee for the 2020-2021 school year, to make changes to education law for the 2020-2021 school year in response to implications of COVID-19, to require the Department of Education to make an additional payment in fiscal year 2020 or 2021 to certain city, local, exempted village, and joint vocational school districts that experience a decrease in the taxable value of the district's utility tangible personal property and have at least one power plant in their territories, to permit a person to serve on more than five community school governing authorities under certain conditions, to extend until November 30, 2022, the moratorium on the building code requirement for storm shelters for school construction projects, to make changes regarding the Quality Community School Support Program, to provide an additional payment for fiscal year 2020 to school districts that experience a specified reduction in funding, to entitle the act the "Ohio Student Religious Liberties Act of 2019," to make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards student religious expression

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18 Effective 9/18/20 - Emergency and appropriations: effective 6/19/2020; certain provisions effective 9/18/2020
2020-06-11HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-06-10SenatePassed
2020-06-10SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2019-12-04SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2019-11-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-13HousePassed
2019-06-27HouseReported: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313601Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
331402Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3320New CodeSee Bill Text
332001New CodeSee Bill Text
332002New CodeSee Bill Text
332003New CodeSee Bill Text
332310New CodeSee Bill Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
3328Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text
37811010Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback