OH HB170 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-12)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.079, 3313.603, 3317.024, and 3317.062 and to enact sections 3301.012, 3314.0110, 3315.17, 3319.236, and 3326.082 of the Revised Code with regard to academic content standards and curriculum requirements for computer science; to revise educator qualifications regarding computer science; to authorize public schools to establish computer science and technology funds; and to permit a nonreligious chartered nonpublic school to choose the manner by which auxiliary services funding is distributed to the school.
Title
Address computer science curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 | |
2017-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Passed |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed |
2017-06-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 079 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 14 | 0110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 15 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 17 | 024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 17 | 062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 236 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 26 | 082 | New Code | See Bill Text |