OH HB171 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-5)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 3313.6022 of the Revised Code to permit public school students to attend and receive credit for released time courses in religious instruction conducted off school property during regular school hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permit public school students to attend and receive credit for released time courses in religious instruction conducted off school property during regular school hours.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-11 Effective Date
2014-06-12 Governor' Action
2014-06-21 End of 10-day period
2014-06-10 Sent to Governor
2014-06-04 Concurrence
2014-06-03 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-05-28 Committee Report - S
2014-01-16 To Education
2014-01-16 Introduced to Senate
2014-01-15 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-12-11 Committee Report
2013-05-21 To Education
2013-05-21 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33New CodeSee Bill Text
3313New CodeSee Bill Text
33136018New CodeSee Bill Text
33136020New CodeSee Bill Text
33136022New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback