OH HB171 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2925.03, 2925.11, and 2929.01 of the Revised Code to decrease the minimum amount of heroin involved in a violation of trafficking in heroin or possession of heroin that makes the violation a felony of the first degree and that is necessary to classify an offender as a major drug offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces heroin amounts for enhanced penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-14 Effective 9/14/16
2016-05-25SenatePassed
2016-05-25SenateReported: Criminal Justice
2015-06-24SenateRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2015-06-18SenateIntroduced
2015-06-17HousePassed
2015-05-27HouseReported: Judiciary
2015-05-05HouseRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2015-04-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292503Amended CodeCitation Text
292511Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292901Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback