OH HB189 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Effective 11/6/19 - Emergency: effective November 6, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1711.51, 1711.53, and 1711.55 and to enact sections 1711.532, 1711.533, and 1711.552 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing amusement ride operation and safety, to designate this act as "Tyler's Law," and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws governing amusement ride operation and safety

Sponsors

Rep. John Patterson [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06 Effective 11/6/19 - Emergency: effective November 6, 2019
2019-10-23SenatePassed
2019-10-22SenateReported: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-06-19SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-06-06SenateIntroduced
2019-06-05HousePassed
2019-06-05HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-10HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1711Amended CodeCitation Text
171151Amended CodeCitation Text
171153Amended CodeCitation Text
1711532New CodeSee Bill Text
1711533New CodeSee Bill Text
171155Amended CodeCitation Text
1711552New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback