OH HB196 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Reported - Amended: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Reported - Amended: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5739.01 of the Revised Code to exempt from sales tax memberships to gyms or other recreational facilities operated by nonprofit 501(c)(3) organizations beginning July 1, 2021.
Title
Exempts from sales tax membership to gyms operated by a nonprofit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | House | Reported - Amended: Ways and Means |
2019-04-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |