OH HB197 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-26)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective 3/27/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-26)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective 3/27/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 122.075, 125.831, 131.45, 133.01, 133.06, 133.07, 133.18, 135.142, 305.31, 306.322, 307.671, 307.672, 307.674, 307.678, 307.695, 319.301, 321.03, 321.20, 323.154, 323.155, 351.01, 351.03, 351.141, 718.01, 718.021, 929.01, 1545.041, 1545.21, 1711.15, 1711.16, 3316.03, 3316.06, 3317.01, 4301.20, 4582.024, 4582.26, 4582.56, 4723.43, 4729.01, 4761.17, 5104.31, 5701.08, 5701.11, 5701.12, 5703.04, 5703.211, 5703.54, 5703.94, 5703.95, 5705.03, 5705.13, 5705.19, 5705.195, 5705.213, 5705.252, 5705.29, 5705.315, 5705.34, 5705.35, 5705.36, 5705.49, 5709.201, 5709.43, 5709.48, 5709.53, 5709.61, 5709.80, 5709.85, 5709.93, 5713.03, 5713.30, 5713.351, 5715.13, 5715.36, 5721.06, 5721.191, 5721.39, 5725.98, 5726.50, 5726.98, 5727.02, 5727.11, 5727.23, 5727.32, 5727.33, 5727.80, 5727.83, 5727.84, 5729.98, 5733.042, 5733.05, 5733.052, 5733.055, 5733.40, 5733.98, 5735.026, 5735.06, 5739.01, 5739.011, 5739.02, 5739.021, 5739.028, 5739.03, 5739.034, 5739.08, 5739.09, 5739.21, 5740.02, 5743.05, 5743.08, 5743.33, 5743.65, 5745.14, 5747.01, 5747.011, 5747.012, 5747.013, 5747.02, 5747.058, 5747.061, 5747.07, 5747.082, 5747.11, 5747.231, 5747.41, 5747.51, 5747.52, 5747.55, 5747.98, 5748.08, 5748.09, 5751.01, 5751.08, 5751.09, 5751.50, 5751.51, 5751.98, and 5753.11; to enact sections 4723.433, 4723.434, 4723.435, 5739.091, 5739.092, 5751.40, 5751.41, and 5751.42; and to repeal sections 901.13, 5705.211, 5727.87, 5733.46, 5739.105, 5747.75, and 5751.23 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 757.40 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to continue essential operations of state government and maintain the continuity of the state tax code in response to the declared pandemic and global health emergency related to COVID-19, to make appropriations, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make technical and corrective changes to tax law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Effective 3/27/20 | |
2020-03-25 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2019-04-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced |