OH HB208 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-02 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2903.13 of the Revised Code to increase the penalties for assault if the victim is acting as a sports official or the assault is committed in retaliation for the victim's actions as a sports official.
Title
Increase penalty for assault if victim a sports official
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-11-18 | House | Passed |
2020-09-24 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2019-04-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |